OK HB2338 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-19 - Approved by Governor 04/19/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-19 - Approved by Governor 04/19/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Employment Security Administration Fund; making appropriation; specifying source; effective date.
Title
Employment Security Administration Fund; making appropriation; specifying source; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-19 | House | Approved by Governor 04/19/2016 |
2016-04-13 | House | Sent to Governor |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2016-04-13 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2016-04-12 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 3 |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Amendment restored bill to engrossed version |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Title restored |
2016-04-12 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Title stricken |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2016-02-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-02-22 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2016-02-18 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2016-02-18 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 4 |
2016-02-18 | House | General Order |
2016-02-11 | House | Authored by Senator Stanislawski (principal Senate author) |
2016-02-11 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2016-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2016-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Wesselhoft |
2016-02-01 | House | First Reading |