OK HB2337 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2337
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-17 - Second Reading referred to General Government
Pending: Senate General Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-17 - Second Reading referred to General Government
Pending: Senate General Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Public health and safety; director; Oklahoma Department of Emergency Management; emergency powers of Governor; emergency proclamations; Legislative approval; effective date.
Title
Public health and safety; director; Oklahoma Department of Emergency Management; emergency powers of Governor; emergency proclamations; Legislative approval; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 61 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House: General Government Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House: General Government Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2021-03-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-03-15 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 61 Nays: 28 |
2021-03-11 | House | Title stricken |
2021-03-11 | House | Amended |
2021-03-11 | House | Authored by Senator Dahm (principal Senate author) |
2021-03-11 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Kendrix |
2021-03-11 | House | General Order |
2021-02-11 | House | CR; Do Pass General Government Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Steagall |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2337 (Carry Over) 2021-03-17 - Second Reading referred to General Government