OK HB2332 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Failed in Committee - Health and Human Services
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Children; enacting the Model Successful Future Alumni Act of 2019; directing the Department of Human Services to create certain pilot program; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Children; enacting the Model Successful Future Alumni Act of 2019; directing the Department of Human Services to create certain pilot program; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: Children, Youth and Family Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08SenateFailed in Committee - Health and Human Services
2019-04-03SenateCoauthored by Senator Smalley
2019-04-03SenateRemove as author Senator Smalley; authored by Senator Hicks
2019-04-03SenateRemove as coauthor Senator Hicks
2019-03-26SenateSecond Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2019-03-18SenateCoauthored by Representative Nollan
2019-03-14SenateCoauthored by Representative Boatman
2019-03-13SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-13HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-03-12HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-03-12HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 3
2019-03-12HouseAmended
2019-03-12HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Ikley-Freeman, Boren
2019-03-12HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Munson, Bell, Brewer, Bush, Roe, Hill, Talley, Albright
2019-03-12HouseGeneral Order
2019-02-21HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Hicks
2019-02-21HouseAuthored by Senator Smalley (principal Senate author)
2019-02-21HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Children, Youth and Family Services Committee
2019-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to Children, Youth and Family Services
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative Branham
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback