OK HB2331 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2331
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-03 - Coauthored by Senator Smalley
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-03 - Coauthored by Senator Smalley
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Children; creating the Children Belong With Families Act t; effective date.
Title
Children; creating the Children Belong With Families Act t; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: Children, Youth and Family Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: Children, Youth and Family Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Smalley |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Smalley; authored by Senator Hicks |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Remove as coauthor Senator Hicks |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Boatman |
2019-03-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 0 |
2019-03-12 | House | Title stricken |
2019-03-12 | House | Amended |
2019-03-12 | House | House Rule suspended |
2019-03-12 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Boren |
2019-03-12 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Munson, Bell, Brewer, Bush, Roe, Talley, Albright |
2019-03-12 | House | General Order |
2019-02-21 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Hicks |
2019-02-21 | House | Authored by Senator Smalley (principal Senate author) |
2019-02-21 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Children, Youth and Family Services Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Children, Youth and Family Services |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Branham |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2331 (Carry Over) 2019-04-03 - Coauthored by Senator Smalley