OK HB2328 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-12 - Approved by Governor 05/09/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-12 - Approved by Governor 05/09/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Motor vehicles; providing for annual permit option; requiring map; emergency.
Title
Motor vehicles; providing for annual permit option; requiring map; emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Allen [R] | Rep. John Bennett [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-16 - Senate - Senate: Reconsider (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2014-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House: Transportation Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2014-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House: Transportation Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-12 | House | Approved by Governor 05/09/2014 |
2014-05-05 | House | Sent to Governor |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2014-05-05 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2014-04-30 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2014-04-30 | House | Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 0 |
2014-04-30 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2014-04-21 | House | SA's received |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 |
2014-04-16 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Backed up to General Order |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Motion to reconsider vote adopted: Ayes: 33 Nays: 0 |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Allen |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Measure failed: Ayes: 16 Nays: 21 |
2014-04-10 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2014-03-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0 |
2014-03-12 | House | Authored by Senator Allen (principal Senate author) |
2014-03-12 | House | General Order |
2014-02-18 | House | CR; Do Pass Transportation Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Transportation |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Bennett |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
47 | 14 | 103G | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 14 | 118 | New Code | See Bill Text |