OK HB2324 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-22 - Referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-22 - Referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
State government; relating to the State and Education Employees Group Insurance Act; Employee Benefits Council. Effective date.
Title
State government; relating to the State and Education Employees Group Insurance Act; Employee Benefits Council. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 62 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-22 | Referred to Appropriations | |
2010-03-22 | Withdrawn from Retirement and Insurance committee | |
2010-03-17 | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance | |
2010-03-15 | First Reading | |
2010-03-15 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-03-11 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-11 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 62 Nays: 13 | |
2010-03-11 | Title stricken | |
2010-03-11 | Amended by floor substitute | |
2010-03-11 | General Order | |
2010-02-23 | Authored by Senator Stanislawski (principal Senate author) | |
2010-02-23 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Government Modernization Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Government Modernization | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Representative Murphey | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 26 | 101 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 26 | 102 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 26 | 104 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 26 | 105 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 1302 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 1303 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 1304 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 1305 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 1305 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 1305 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 1305 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 1306 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 1306 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 1306 | 3 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 1306 | 4 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 1306 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 1306 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 1307 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 1307 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 1308 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 1308 | 1 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 1309 | 1 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 1310 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 1310 | 1 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 1310 | 2 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 1312 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 1312 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 1312 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 1314 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 1314 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 1315 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 1315 | 1 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 1316 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 1316 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 1317 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 1318 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 1320 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 1321 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 1332 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 1332 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 1333 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 1335 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 1341 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 1342 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 1343 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 1344 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 1346 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 1347 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 1348 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 1362 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 1363 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 1364 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 1365 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 1365 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 1365 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 1365 | 2 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 1365 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 1365 | 4 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 1365 | 5 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 1365 | 6 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 1365 | 7 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 1365 | 8 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 1365 | 9 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 1366 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 1366 | 1 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 1366 | 2 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 1370 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 1371 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 1372 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 1374 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 1375 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 1381 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 1382 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |