OK HB2323 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2323
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-0)
Status: Failed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-06 - Failed in Committee - Public Safety
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-0)
Status: Failed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-06 - Failed in Committee - Public Safety
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Crimes and punishment; modifying manner in which firearms may be carried in vehicles; effective date.
Title
Crimes and punishment; modifying manner in which firearms may be carried in vehicles; effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Josh Brecheen [R] | Rep. Jeff Coody [R] | Rep. Kevin Calvey [R] | Rep. George Faught [R] |
Rep. Pat Ownbey [R] | Rep. Mike Ritze [R] | Rep. Lewis Moore [R] | Rep. John Bennett [R] |
Rep. Sean Roberts [R] | Rep. Tommy Hardin [R] | Sen. Ann Griffin [R] | Sen. Nathan Dahm [R] |
Rep. Bobby Cleveland [R] | Rep. John Jordan [R] | Rep. Greg Babinec [R] | Rep. Dale Derby [R] |
Rep. Tom Gann [R] | Rep. Kyle Hilbert [R] | Rep. Kevin McDugle [R] | Rep. Scott McEachin [R] |
Rep. Josh West [R] | Sen. Micheal Bergstrom [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 70 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-06 | Senate | Failed in Committee - Public Safety |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Griffin |
2017-04-03 | Senate | coauthored by Hardin |
2017-03-30 | Senate | coauthored by Cleveland |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom |
2017-03-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-22 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-03-21 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-21 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 70 Nays: 16 |
2017-03-21 | House | Amended |
2017-03-21 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Dahm |
2017-03-21 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Faught, Bennett (John), Calvey, Gann, Roberts (Sean), Jordan, McEachin, Babinec, Derby, Hilbert, West (Josh) |
2017-03-21 | House | General Order |
2017-03-20 | House | Remove Senator Shortey as principal Senate author and substitute with Senator Brecheen |
2017-02-16 | House | Authored by Senator Shortey (principal Senate author) |
2017-02-16 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Ownbey, McDugle, Moore, Ritze |
2017-02-16 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Coody |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2323 (Carry Over) 2017-04-06 - Failed in Committee - Public Safety
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
21 | 1289 | 13A | New Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 1289 | 16 | New Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 1289 | 23 | New Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 1289 | 25 | New Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 1289 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 1289 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 1290 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 1290 | 26 | New Code | See Bill Text |