OK HB2319 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Crimes and punishments; clarifying jurisdictional boundaries for certain peace officers; effective date.
Title
Crimes and punishments; clarifying jurisdictional boundaries for certain peace officers; effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Ralph Shortey [R] | Rep. Ben Loring [D] | Sen. Susan Paddack [D] | Rep. Lisa Billy [R] |
Sen. Wayne Shaw [R] | Sen. Anastasia Pittman [D] | Sen. Kevin Matthews [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-25 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 31 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 26 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 26 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-27 | House | Approved by Governor 06/06/2016 |
2016-05-26 | House | Sent to Governor |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2016-05-26 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2016-05-25 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 31 Nays: 14 |
2016-05-25 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2016-05-18 | Senate | CCR read |
2016-05-18 | House | To Senate |
2016-05-18 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0 |
2016-05-18 | House | CCR adopted |
2016-05-11 | House | Title restored |
2016-05-11 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Shaw |
2016-05-11 | House | Remove Senator Shaw as principal Senate author and substitute with Senator Shortey |
2016-05-11 | House | CCR submitted |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Shaw, Barrington, David, Brooks, Treat, Matthews, Pittman |
2016-04-26 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Public Safety |
2016-04-21 | House | SA's received |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 26 Nays: 20 |
2016-04-20 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2016-04-18 | Senate | coauthored by Matthews |
2016-04-18 | Senate | coauthored by Pittman |
2016-04-18 | Senate | General Order, considered and deferred |
2016-04-07 | Senate | coauthored by Billy |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Title stricken |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2016-03-23 | Senate | coauthored by Paddack |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2016-03-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-03-14 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2016-03-10 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2016-03-10 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 72 Nays: 0 |
2016-03-10 | House | Amended |
2016-03-10 | House | Authored by Senator Shaw (principal Senate author) |
2016-03-10 | House | General Order |
2016-02-18 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee |
2016-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2016-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Loring |
2016-02-01 | House | First Reading |