OK HB2317 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2317
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-27 - Approved by Governor 04/27/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-27 - Approved by Governor 04/27/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Children; grievance process; Oklahoma Commission on Children and Youth; Office of Juvenile System Oversight; procedures; rules; effective date.
Title
Children; grievance process; Oklahoma Commission on Children and Youth; Office of Juvenile System Oversight; procedures; rules; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Lawson [R] | Sen. John Haste [R] | Rep. Cyndi Munson [D] | Rep. Sheila Dills [R] |
Sen. Kay Floyd [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House: Children, Youth and Family Services Committee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House: Children, Youth and Family Services Committee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-27 | House | Approved by Governor 04/27/2021 |
2021-04-22 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2021-04-22 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2021-04-21 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Floyd |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2021-03-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-03-03 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-03-02 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-02 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0 |
2021-03-02 | House | Authored by Senator Haste (principal Senate author) |
2021-03-02 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Munson, Dills |
2021-03-02 | House | General Order |
2021-02-09 | House | CR; Do Pass Children, Youth and Family Services Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Children, Youth and Family Services |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Lawson |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2317 (Carry Over) 2021-04-27 - Approved by Governor 04/27/2021