OK HB2310 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2310
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-15 - CCR submitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-15 - CCR submitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Criminal procedure; directing court to instruct juries on laws relating to punishment and sentencing alternatives; repealer; effective date.
Title
Criminal procedure; directing court to instruct juries on laws relating to punishment and sentencing alternatives; repealer; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | House | CCR submitted |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Bice, Daniels, Jech, Coleman, Brooks, Floyd, Shaw |
2019-05-01 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Judiciary |
2019-04-29 | House | SA's received |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 1 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Enacting clause restored |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Title restored |
2019-04-25 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2019-03-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-07 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-06 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 3 |
2019-03-06 | House | Title stricken |
2019-03-06 | House | Amended |
2019-03-06 | House | House Rule suspended |
2019-03-06 | House | Authored by Senator Bice (principal Senate author) |
2019-03-06 | House | General Order |
2019-02-18 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Frix |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2310 (Carry Over) 2019-05-15 - CCR submitted