OK HB2304 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 32-14)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Referred to Legislative Actuary under 62 O.S., Section 3108
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Public retirement systems; Oklahoma Pension Legislation Actuarial Analysis Act; benefit increase; effective dates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public retirement systems; Oklahoma Pension Legislation Actuarial Analysis Act; benefit increase; effective dates.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 98 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-11SenateReferred to Legislative Actuary under 62 O.S., Section 3108
2019-04-09SenateReferred to Retirement and Insurance
2019-04-09SenateWithdrawn from Appropriations committee
2019-04-08SenateCoauthored by Senator Silk
2019-03-26SenateCoauthored by Representative McBride
2019-03-25SenateCoauthored by Representative Hill
2019-03-25SenateSecond Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2019-03-19SenateCoauthored by Senator Hicks
2019-03-18SenateCoauthored by Representative Mize
2019-03-18SenateCoauthored by Representative Roberts (Sean)
2019-03-14SenateCoauthored by Senator Boggs
2019-03-12Senatecoauthored by Weaver
2019-03-12SenateCoauthored by Representative Moore
2019-03-12SenateCoauthored by Representative West (Josh)
2019-03-12SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-12HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-03-11HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-03-11HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 98 Nays: 3
2019-03-11HouseAmended
2019-03-11HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Rosino, Pederson, Dugger, Hall, Scott, Stanley, Kidd
2019-03-11HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Luttrell, Kerbs, Branham, Kannady, May, Dunnington, Munson, Conley, Meredith, Rosecrants, Dollens, Perryman, Loring, Ranson, West (Tammy), Fetgatter, Baker, Fugate, Humphrey, Sneed, Pae, Tadlock, Nollan, Manger, Albright, Lawson, Goodwin
2019-03-11HouseGeneral Order
2019-02-27HouseAuthored by Senator Pemberton (principal Senate author)
2019-02-27HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee
2019-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to Banking, Financial Services and Pensions
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative Frix
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback