OK HB2298 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2298
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-17 - Approved by Governor 04/17/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-17 - Approved by Governor 04/17/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Income tax credits; credits for electricity generated by zero-emission facilities; effective date; emergency.
Title
Income tax credits; credits for electricity generated by zero-emission facilities; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Schulz [R] | Rep. Charles McCall [R] | Sen. Bryce Marlatt [R] | Rep. Mike Sanders [R] |
Rep. John Bennett [R] | Rep. David Brumbaugh [R] | Sen. Greg Treat [R] | Rep. Terry O'Donnell [R] |
Rep. Dell Kerbs [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-10 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 69 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 74 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 22 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 69 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 74 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 22 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-17 | House | Approved by Governor 04/17/2017 |
2017-04-11 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2017-04-11 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2017-04-10 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 3 |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Amendment restored bill to engrossed version |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Emergency clause restored |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Title restored |
2017-04-10 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Marlatt |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Treat |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2017-03-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-20 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-03-14 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-14 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Sanders, Brumbaugh |
2017-03-14 | House | Motion expired |
2017-03-09 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Echols |
2017-03-09 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 74 Nays: 24; Ayes: 69 Nays: 25 |
2017-03-09 | House | Authored by Senator Schulz (principal Senate author) |
2017-03-09 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Bennett (John), Kerbs |
2017-03-09 | House | General Order |
2017-03-02 | House | Emergency added |
2017-03-02 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) O'Donnell |
2017-03-02 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative McCall |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2298 (Carry Over) 2017-04-17 - Approved by Governor 04/17/2017