OK HB2296 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-10 - Approved by Governor 05/06/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-10 - Approved by Governor 05/06/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Schools; modifying certain education administration certification requirements. Emergency.
Title
Schools; modifying certain education administration certification requirements. Emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Neil Brannon [D] | Rep. Ed Cannaday [D] | Rep. John Carey [D] | Rep. Lee Denney [R] |
Sen. Jay Gumm [D] | Rep. Jeannie McDaniel [D] | Rep. Glen Smithson [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-05-03 - House - House: (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2010-02-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2010-02-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-10 | Approved by Governor 05/06/2010 | |
2010-05-04 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-04 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2010-05-04 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2010-05-03 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-03 | Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0 | |
2010-05-03 | SA's read, adopted | |
2010-04-08 | SA's received | |
2010-04-08 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-04-07 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-07 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 | |
2010-04-07 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-03-23 | Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed | |
2010-03-22 | Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; pending CR | |
2010-03-08 | Second Reading referred to Education | |
2010-02-22 | First Reading | |
2010-02-22 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-02-18 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-02-18 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0 | |
2010-02-18 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Denney, Smithson, Brannon | |
2010-02-18 | General Order | |
2010-02-15 | Authored by Senator Gumm (principal Senate author) | |
2010-02-15 | Coauthored by Representative(s) McDaniel (Jeannie), Cannaday | |
2010-02-15 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Common Education | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Representative Carey | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |