OK HB2292 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2292
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Approved by Governor 04/04/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Approved by Governor 04/04/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Law enforcement; allowing certain individuals to attend courses and training at technology center schools and higher education institutions; effective date.
Title
Law enforcement; allowing certain individuals to attend courses and training at technology center schools and higher education institutions; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | House | Approved by Governor 04/04/2019 |
2019-04-01 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2019-04-01 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-28 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 3 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2019-02-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-21 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-02-20 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-02-20 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0 |
2019-02-20 | House | General Order |
2019-02-14 | House | Authored by Senator Jech (principal Senate author) |
2019-02-14 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Wright |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2292 (Carry Over) 2019-04-04 - Approved by Governor 04/04/2019