OK HB2288 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2288
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-21 - Authored by Senator Stanislawski (principal Senate author)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-21 - Authored by Senator Stanislawski (principal Senate author)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Public health and safety; creating Oklahoma Workplace Clean Air Act; prohibiting smoking in public places; effective date.
Title
Public health and safety; creating Oklahoma Workplace Clean Air Act; prohibiting smoking in public places; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Harold Wright [R] | Sen. Gary Stanislawski [R] | Rep. Jason Dunnington [D] | Rep. Cyndi Munson [D] |
Rep. Carol Bush [R] | Rep. Merleyn Bell [D] | Rep. Nicole Miller [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-19 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-21 | House | Authored by Senator Stanislawski (principal Senate author) |
2019-02-21 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Miller, Dunnington, Munson, Bush, Bell |
2019-02-21 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2019-02-06 | House | Withdrawn from Energy and Natural Resources Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Energy and Natural Resources |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Wright |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2288 (Carry Over) 2019-02-21 - Authored by Senator Stanislawski (principal Senate author)