OK HB2286 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2286
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Pardon and parole; parole eligibility requirements; administrative parole; risk-assessment instruments; effective date.
Title
Pardon and parole; parole eligibility requirements; administrative parole; risk-assessment instruments; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Terry O'Donnell [R] | Sen. Greg Treat [R] | Sen. Ron Sharp [R] | Sen. Darcy Jech [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 84 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 81 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 84 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 81 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | House | Approved by Governor 04/26/2018 |
2018-04-25 | House | Sent to Governor |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2018-04-25 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2018-04-24 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | 2 CCR adopted |
2018-04-17 | Senate | 2 CCR read |
2018-04-17 | House | To Senate |
2018-04-17 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 5 |
2018-04-17 | House | 2 CCR adopted |
2018-03-29 | House | Enacting clause restored |
2018-03-29 | House | Title restored |
2018-03-29 | House | 2 CCR submitted |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Treat, Fry, Thompson, Jech, Shaw, Floyd, Matthews |
2018-02-06 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Public Safety |
2017-05-26 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Sharp, Jech |
2017-05-26 | House | Remove as coauthor Senator(s) Pittman |
2017-05-26 | House | CCR submitted; conferees unable to agree |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Treat, Fry, Shaw, Thompson, Jech, Floyd, Matthews |
2017-05-03 | House | HC's changed: Withdrawn from Conference Committee on Public Safety and naming Conference Committee on Judiciary - Criminal Justice and Corrections |
2017-05-02 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Public Safety |
2017-04-27 | House | SA's received |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 1 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Pittman |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2017-03-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-21 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-03-20 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-20 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 3 |
2017-03-20 | House | Title stricken |
2017-03-20 | House | Amended |
2017-03-20 | House | Authored by Senator Treat (principal Senate author) |
2017-03-20 | House | General Order |
2017-03-02 | House | Emergency removed |
2017-03-02 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative O'Donnell |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2286 (Carry Over) 2017-05-26 - Coauthored by Senator(s) Sharp, Jech
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
57 | 332 | 1A | New Code | See Bill Text |
57 | 332 | 1B | New Code | See Bill Text |
57 | 332 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
57 | 332 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
57 | 332 | 7b | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
57 | 332 | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
57 | 332 | 8a | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
57 | 510 | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
57 | 512 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
57 | 512 | 2 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
57 | 512 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |