OK HB2280 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-05 - Approved by Governor 05/05/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-05 - Approved by Governor 05/05/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public health and safety; Continuum of Care and Assisted Living Act; requiring Department of Health to develop a classification system of violations; effective date.
Title
Public health and safety; Continuum of Care and Assisted Living Act; requiring Department of Health to develop a classification system of violations; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-28 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 67 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 70 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 70 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-05 | House | Approved by Governor 05/05/2016 |
2016-05-02 | House | Sent to Governor |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2016-05-02 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2016-04-28 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2016-04-28 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 67 Nays: 16 |
2016-04-28 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2016-04-14 | House | SA's received |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 |
2016-04-13 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2016-04-11 | Senate | coauthored by Pittman |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Title restored |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2016-03-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-03-10 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2016-03-09 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2016-03-09 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 70 Nays: 16 |
2016-03-09 | House | Title stricken |
2016-03-09 | House | Amended |
2016-03-09 | House | Authored by Senator Standridge (principal Senate author) |
2016-03-09 | House | General Order |
2016-02-17 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee |
2016-02-10 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2016-02-10 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2016-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2016-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Murphey |
2016-02-01 | House | First Reading |