OK HB2280 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-08 - Second Reading referred to Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-08 - Second Reading referred to Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Counties and county officers; county commissioners; modifying date for publishing holidays; vacancies in county offices; effective date.
Title
Counties and county officers; county commissioners; modifying date for publishing holidays; vacancies in county offices; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - House: General Government Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - House: General Government Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-08 | Second Reading referred to Rules | |
2012-02-22 | First Reading | |
2012-02-22 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-02-21 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-02-21 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0 | |
2012-02-21 | General Order | |
2012-02-16 | Authored by Senator Ballenger (principal Senate author) | |
2012-02-16 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to General Government | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative Glenn | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |