OK HB2277 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2277
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-24 - General Order, considered and deferred
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-24 - General Order, considered and deferred
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Schools; United States Flag; requiring pupils to recite pledge of allegiance daily; effective date.
Title
Schools; United States Flag; requiring pupils to recite pledge of allegiance daily; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Terry O'Donnell [R] | Sen. Marty Quinn [R] | Rep. Mike Ritze [R] | Rep. Sean Roberts [R] |
Rep. Bobby Cleveland [R] | Rep. Carl Newton [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-24 | Senate | General Order, considered and deferred |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2017-03-20 | Senate | coauthored by Roberts (Sean) |
2017-03-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-14 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-03-13 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-13 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 1 |
2017-03-13 | House | Authored by Senator Quinn (principal Senate author) |
2017-03-13 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Ritze, Newton |
2017-03-13 | House | General Order |
2017-02-14 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Cleveland |
2017-02-14 | House | CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative O'Donnell |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2277 (Carry Over) 2017-04-24 - General Order, considered and deferred