OK HB2276 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - Second Reading referred to Energy
Pending: Senate Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - Second Reading referred to Energy
Pending: Senate Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Eminent domain; authorizing property owner to file request for judicial location exception in certain actions; effective date.
Title
Eminent domain; authorizing property owner to file request for judicial location exception in certain actions; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-01 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 62 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House: ADOPT AMENDMENT (Y: 52 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 34) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House: Judiciary and Civil Procedure Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House: ADOPT AMENDMENT (Y: 52 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 34) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House: Judiciary and Civil Procedure Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Energy |
2016-03-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-03-02 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2016-03-01 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2016-03-01 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 62 Nays: 29 |
2016-03-01 | House | Ayes: 52 Nays: 15 |
2016-03-01 | House | Amended |
2016-03-01 | House | House Rule suspended |
2016-03-01 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Kouplen |
2016-03-01 | House | General Order |
2016-02-10 | House | Authored by Senator Halligan (principal Senate author) |
2016-02-10 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary and Civil Procedure Committee |
2016-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary and Civil Procedure |
2016-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Denney |
2016-02-01 | House | First Reading |