OK HB2249 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2249
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on April 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-11 - Failed in Committee - Education
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on April 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-11 - Failed in Committee - Education
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Schools; student transfers participating in certain athletic competition; granting eligibility for certain transfer students; immediate eligibility for students who transfer prior to sophomore year; effective date.
Title
Schools; student transfers participating in certain athletic competition; granting eligibility for certain transfer students; immediate eligibility for students who transfer prior to sophomore year; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Ty Burns [R] | Sen. Adam Pugh [R] | Rep. Kyle Hilbert [R] | Rep. Lonnie Sims [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Education: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-03-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 62 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 62 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-11 | Senate | Failed in Committee - Education |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2023-03-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-21 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2023-03-20 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-20 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 62 Nays: 20 |
2023-03-20 | House | Title stricken |
2023-03-20 | House | Amended |
2023-03-20 | House | Authored by Senator Pugh (principal Senate author) |
2023-03-20 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Sims |
2023-03-20 | House | General Order |
2023-02-22 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hilbert |
2023-02-22 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2023-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Burns |
2023-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2249 (Carry Over) 2023-04-11 - Failed in Committee - Education