OK HB2248 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2248
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Second Reading referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Second Reading referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; lists and returns; modifying requirement for statements to be submitted under oath; effective date.
Title
Revenue and taxation; lists and returns; modifying requirement for statements to be submitted under oath; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Todd Russ [R] | Sen. Brent Howard [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 56 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: Business and Commerce Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: Business and Commerce Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2019-03-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-14 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-13 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 56 Nays: 37 |
2019-03-13 | House | Authored by Senator Howard (principal Senate author) |
2019-03-13 | House | General Order |
2019-02-21 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Business and Commerce |
2019-02-13 | House | Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2019-02-12 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2019-02-12 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Russ |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2248 (Carry Over) 2019-03-26 - Second Reading referred to Finance