OK HB2231 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-18 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-18 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Liens; creating the Oklahoma Construction Registry Act; effective date.
Title
Liens; creating the Oklahoma Construction Registry Act; effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Newberry [R] | Rep. Kevin Wallace [R] | Rep. Richard Morrissette [D] | Rep. Leslie Osborn [R] |
Rep. Mike Sanders [R] | Rep. Dan Kirby [R] | Rep. Lewis Moore [R] | Rep. Tom Newell [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 81 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House: Economic Development, Commerce, and Real Estate Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House: Economic Development, Commerce, and Real Estate Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2015-03-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-03-11 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-03-10 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-10 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 15 |
2015-03-10 | House | Title stricken |
2015-03-10 | House | Amended |
2015-03-10 | House | Authored by Senator Newberry (principal Senate author) |
2015-03-10 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Newell, Osborn, Kirby, Moore, Sanders, Morrissette |
2015-03-10 | House | General Order |
2015-02-19 | House | Remove Representative Echols as principal House author and substitute with Representative Wallace |
2015-02-19 | House | CR; Do Pass Economic Development, Commerce, and Real Estate Committee |
2015-02-11 | House | Referred to Economic Development, Commerce, and Real Estate |
2015-02-11 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Echols |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
42 | 160 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
42 | 160 | 2 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
42 | 160 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
42 | 160 | 4 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
42 | 160 | 5 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
42 | 160 | 6 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
42 | 160 | 7 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
42 | 160 | 8 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |