OK HB2225 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2225
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Cities and towns; modifying process for disposing of certain property or money; effective date.
Title
Cities and towns; modifying process for disposing of certain property or money; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-04 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate: Committee On General Government: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House: Judiciary-Civil Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate: Committee On General Government: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House: Judiciary-Civil Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | House | Approved by Governor 05/10/2021 |
2021-05-05 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2021-05-05 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2021-05-04 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2021-05-04 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 0 |
2021-05-04 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2021-04-22 | House | SA's received |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 2 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government committee; CR filed |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2021-03-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-03-02 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-03-01 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-01 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 1 |
2021-03-01 | House | General Order |
2021-02-16 | House | Authored by Senator Weaver (principal Senate author) |
2021-02-16 | House | CR; Do Pass Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Moore |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2225 (Carry Over) 2021-05-10 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2021