OK HB2217 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2217
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-03 - Motion expired
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-03 - Motion expired
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Public health and safety; limiting locations in which certain commercial marijuana businesses may operate; effective date.
Title
Public health and safety; limiting locations in which certain commercial marijuana businesses may operate; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-01 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2021-02-11 - House - House: Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House: Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-03 | House | Motion expired |
2021-03-01 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative McDugle |
2021-03-01 | House | Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 57 |
2021-03-01 | House | Authored by Senator Taylor (principal Senate author) |
2021-03-01 | House | General Order |
2021-02-11 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative McDugle |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2217 (Carry Over) 2021-03-03 - Motion expired