OK HB2217 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 28-4)
Status: Passed on April 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-29 - Approved by Governor 04/29/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 28-4)
Status: Passed on April 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-29 - Approved by Governor 04/29/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Public health and safety; adding certain substances to Schedules I and II; relating to the Oklahoma Methamphetamine Offender Registry Act; effective date.
Title
Public health and safety; adding certain substances to Schedules I and II; relating to the Oklahoma Methamphetamine Offender Registry Act; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. David Derby [R] | Sen. Corey Brooks [R] | Sen. Cliff Branan [R] | Sen. Harry Coates [R] |
Sen. Don Barrington [R] | Sen. Brian Crain [R] | Sen. Clark Jolley [R] | Rep. Ben Sherrer [D] |
Sen. Mike Schulz [R] | Sen. Brian Bingman [R] | Rep. Mike Brown [D] | Rep. Mike Brown [D] |
Sen. Tom Ivester [D] | Sen. Anthony Sykes [R] | Sen. Jim Halligan [R] | Sen. Bryce Marlatt [R] |
Sen. Gary Stanislawski [R] | Sen. Mark Allen [R] | Sen. Josh Brecheen [R] | Sen. Eddie Fields [R] |
Sen. Frank Simpson [R] | Sen. Kim David [R] | Sen. David Holt [R] | Sen. Rick Brinkley [R] |
Rep. John Bennett [R] | Sen. Ann Griffin [R] | Sen. Kyle Loveless [R] | Sen. Ron Sharp [R] |
Sen. Wayne Shaw [R] | Sen. Larry Boggs [R] | Sen. Rob Standridge [R] | Rep. Scott Biggs [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-29 | House | Approved by Governor 04/29/2013 |
2013-04-23 | House | Sent to Governor |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2013-04-23 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2013-04-22 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2013-04-22 | Senate | coauthored by Marlatt, David, Schulz, Brecheen, Boggs, Stanislawski, Allen, Coates, Sharp, Shaw, Loveless, Griffin, Fields, Brinkley, Holt, Brown, Barrington, Crain, Halligan, Standridge, Simpson, Branan, Bingman, Jolley, Sykes |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2013-04-22 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2013-03-26 | Senate | coauthored by Ivester |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2013-03-06 | Senate | coauthored by Bennett |
2013-03-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-03-06 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-03-05 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-05 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 1 |
2013-03-05 | House | Authored by Senator Brooks (principal Senate author) |
2013-03-05 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Brown, Biggs, Sherrer |
2013-03-05 | House | General Order |
2013-02-14 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee |
2013-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2013-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Derby |
2013-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
63 | 2 | 101 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 204 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 206 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 210 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 212 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 309D | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 312 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 332 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 401 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 701 | New Code | See Bill Text |