OK HB2216 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2216
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-15 - CCR submitted; conferees unable to agree
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-15 - CCR submitted; conferees unable to agree
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Public health and safety; establishing procedure for a judicial record of death; effective date.
Title
Public health and safety; establishing procedure for a judicial record of death; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Stan May [R] | Sen. Julie Daniels [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | House | CCR submitted; conferees unable to agree |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Daniels, Jech, Howard, Paxton, Boren, Brooks |
2019-05-02 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Public Health |
2019-04-01 | House | SA's received |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Dossett; authored by Senator Daniels |
2019-03-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-06 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-05 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-05 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 |
2019-03-05 | House | Authored by Senator Dossett (principal Senate author) |
2019-03-05 | House | General Order |
2019-02-26 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Health |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative May |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2216 (Carry Over) 2019-05-15 - CCR submitted; conferees unable to agree