OK HB2201 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2201
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Second Reading referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Second Reading referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; state revenue administration; tax procedures; multiple taxes; effective date; emergency.
Title
Revenue and taxation; state revenue administration; tax procedures; multiple taxes; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2019-03-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 1 |
2019-03-12 | House | Authored by Senator Newhouse (principal Senate author) |
2019-03-12 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Fetgatter |
2019-03-12 | House | Remove Representative Fetgatter as principal House author and substitute with Representative Boatman |
2019-03-12 | House | General Order |
2019-03-11 | House | Withdrawn from Rules, Direct to Calendar |
2019-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Fetgatter |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2201 (Carry Over) 2019-03-26 - Second Reading referred to Finance