OK HB2194 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2194
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-02 - Authored by Senator Simpson (principal Senate author)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-02 - Authored by Senator Simpson (principal Senate author)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Condemnation and eminent domain; modifying certain rules and procedures; effective date.
Title
Condemnation and eminent domain; modifying certain rules and procedures; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-28 - House - House: Wildlife Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-02 | House | Authored by Senator Simpson (principal Senate author) |
2017-03-02 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Bennett (John) |
2017-03-02 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Wildlife Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Wildlife |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Park |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2194 (Carry Over) 2017-03-02 - Authored by Senator Simpson (principal Senate author)