OK HB2180 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-19 - CCR submitted; conferees unable to agree
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-19 - CCR submitted; conferees unable to agree
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Higher education; modifying eligibility requirements for the Oklahoma Higher Learning Access Program.
Title
Higher education; modifying eligibility requirements for the Oklahoma Higher Learning Access Program.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeffrey Hickman [R] | Sen. Gary Stanislawski [R] | Rep. Lee Denney [R] | Sen. John Montgomery [R] |
Sen. Anastasia Pittman [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-20 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - House - House: RECONSIDER EMERGENCY (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 39) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 64 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 72 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House: Higher Education and Career Tech Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - House - House: RECONSIDER EMERGENCY (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 39) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 64 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 72 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House: Higher Education and Career Tech Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-19 | House | CCR submitted; conferees unable to agree |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Stanislawski, Ford, Halligan, Smalley, Jolley, Bass, Garrison |
2015-04-22 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Higher Education and Career Tech |
2015-04-21 | House | SA's received |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2015-04-20 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2015-04-20 | Senate | coauthored by Pittman |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Title stricken |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Title stricken |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2015-03-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-03-11 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-03-10 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-10 | House | Emergency passed: Ayes: 68 Nays: 10 |
2015-03-10 | House | Motion to reconsider adopted: Ayes: 59 Nays: 3 |
2015-03-05 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Hickman |
2015-03-05 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 72 Nays: 10; Ayes: 64 Nays: 16 |
2015-03-05 | House | Authored by Senator Stanislawski (principal Senate author) |
2015-03-05 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Montgomery, Denney |
2015-03-05 | House | General Order |
2015-02-19 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Higher Education and Career Tech Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Higher Education and Career Tech |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Hickman |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |