OK HB2180 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-22 - Coauthored by Representative(s) Morrissette
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-22 - Coauthored by Representative(s) Morrissette
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Roads, bridges and ferries; creating the Oklahoma Railways Commission; effective date; emergency.
Title
Roads, bridges and ferries; creating the Oklahoma Railways Commission; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 71 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 71 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-22 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Morrissette |
2013-05-22 | House | CCR submitted; conferees unable to agree |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Conference granted, GCCA |
2013-05-06 | House | HC's named: Conference Committee on Transportation |
2013-05-02 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later |
2013-04-24 | House | SA's received |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-04-23 | Senate | coauthored by Smalley |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2013-04-23 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2013-04-11 | Senate | coauthored by Johnson (Constance) |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Title stricken |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2013-04-02 | Senate | coauthored by Boggs |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Title stricken |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Transportation committee; CR filed |
2013-03-25 | Senate | coauthored by McAffrey |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Transportation Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2013-03-18 | Senate | coauthored by Paddack, Sharp |
2013-03-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-03-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-03-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 71 Nays: 18 |
2013-03-12 | House | Authored by Senator Schulz (principal Senate author) |
2013-03-12 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Shannon, Pittman |
2013-03-12 | House | General Order |
2013-02-26 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Newell, Cockroft, Wood, Kouplen |
2013-02-26 | House | CR; Do Pass Transportation Committee |
2013-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Transportation |
2013-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Joyner |
2013-02-04 | House | First Reading |