OK HB2178 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-08 - coauthored by Crain
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-08 - coauthored by Crain
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Oil and gas; modifying powers of cities and towns to regulate oil and gas drilling or production; repealer; emergency.
Title
Oil and gas; modifying powers of cities and towns to regulate oil and gas drilling or production; repealer; emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeffrey Hickman [R] | Sen. Brian Bingman [R] | Sen. Brian Crain [R] | Sen. Bryce Marlatt [R] |
Rep. Leslie Osborn [R] | Rep. Mark McBride [R] | Sen. Casey Murdock [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-11 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 69 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 74 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT (Y: 58 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: Environmental Law Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 74 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT (Y: 58 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: Environmental Law Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-08 | Senate | coauthored by Crain |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Energy committee; CR filed |
2015-04-01 | Senate | coauthored by Marlatt |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Energy |
2015-03-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-03-16 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 74 Nays: 23; Ayes: 69 Nays: 26 |
2015-03-11 | House | Amended |
2015-03-11 | House | Authored by Senator Bingman (principal Senate author) |
2015-03-11 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) McBride, Murdock, Osborn |
2015-03-11 | House | General Order |
2015-02-10 | House | CR; Do Pass Environmental Law Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Environmental Law |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Hickman |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |