OK HB2160 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2160
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-28 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Higher Education and Career Tech Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-28 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Higher Education and Career Tech Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Oklahoma State University Medical Authority; members; qualifications; powers and duties; Oklahoma State University Medical Trust; increasing certain asset limit; effective date.
Title
Oklahoma State University Medical Authority; members; qualifications; powers and duties; Oklahoma State University Medical Trust; increasing certain asset limit; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Cynthia Roe [R] | Sen. John Haste [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-27 - House - House: Higher Education and Career Tech Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-28 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Higher Education and Career Tech Committee |
2023-02-14 | House | Referred to Higher Education and Career Tech |
2023-02-14 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2023-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Roe |
2023-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2160 (Carry Over) 2023-02-28 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Higher Education and Career Tech Committee