OK HB2158 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-11 - Approved by Governor 05/11/2009
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-11 - Approved by Governor 05/11/2009
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Game and fish; authorizing the Oklahoma Department of Agriculture, Food, and Forestry to issue a management-by-use-of-aircraft permit to certain persons. Effective date.
Title
Game and fish; authorizing the Oklahoma Department of Agriculture, Food, and Forestry to issue a management-by-use-of-aircraft permit to certain persons. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Don Armes [R] | Sen. Mike Schulz [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-05-04 - House - House: (Y: 92 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2009-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2009-03-09 - House - House: A (Y: 65 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2009-03-09 - House - House: R (Y: 69 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2009-02-24 - House - House: Wildlife Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2009-03-09 - House - House: A (Y: 65 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2009-03-09 - House - House: R (Y: 69 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2009-02-24 - House - House: Wildlife Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Approved by Governor 05/11/2009 | |
2009-05-05 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-05-05 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2009-05-05 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2009-05-04 | Referred for enrollment | |
2009-05-04 | Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 4 | |
2009-05-04 | SA's read, adopted | |
2009-04-21 | SA's received | |
2009-04-21 | Engrossed to House | |
2009-04-20 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-04-20 | Motion to reconsider vote tabled | |
2009-04-16 | Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Schulz | |
2009-04-16 | Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 9 | |
2009-04-16 | General Order, Considered | |
2009-04-06 | Reported Do Pass as amended Tourism and Wildlife committee; CR filed | |
2009-04-02 | Reported Do Pass as amended Tourism and Wildlife committee; pending CR | |
2009-03-18 | Second Reading referred to Tourism and Wildlife | |
2009-03-10 | First Reading | |
2009-03-10 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2009-03-09 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-03-09 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 12 | |
2009-03-09 | Adoption of amendment rescinded | |
2009-03-09 | Amended | |
2009-03-09 | Authored by Senator Schulz (principal Senate author) | |
2009-03-09 | General Order | |
2009-02-25 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Wildlife Committee | |
2009-02-16 | Referred to Wildlife Committee | |
2009-02-16 | Withdrawn from Rules Committee | |
2009-02-03 | Second Reading referred to Rules | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Representative Armes | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29 | 4 | 107 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 5 | 203 | New Code | See Bill Text |