OK HB2152 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-07 - Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-07 - Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Property; clarifying power of alienation of trust property; effective date.
Title
Property; clarifying power of alienation of trust property; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: Judiciary and Civil Procedure Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: Judiciary and Civil Procedure Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-07 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2015-03-09 | Senate | coauthored by McCullough |
2015-03-05 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-03-05 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-03-04 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-04 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 |
2015-03-04 | House | Authored by Senator Sykes (principal Senate author) |
2015-03-04 | House | General Order |
2015-02-11 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary and Civil Procedure Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary and Civil Procedure |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Echols |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |