OK HB2142 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2142
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Approved by Governor 05/14/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Approved by Governor 05/14/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
McClellan-Kerr Arkansas River Navigation System; creating the Tri-State Commission on the McClellan-Kerr Arkansas River Navigation System; emergency.
Title
McClellan-Kerr Arkansas River Navigation System; creating the Tri-State Commission on the McClellan-Kerr Arkansas River Navigation System; emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Sneed [R] | Sen. Kim David [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-14 | House | Approved by Governor 05/14/2019 |
2019-05-08 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2019-05-08 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2019-05-07 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2019-05-07 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0 |
2019-05-07 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2019-04-25 | House | SA's received |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 1 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Emergency clause restored |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Title restored |
2019-04-24 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2019-03-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0 |
2019-03-12 | House | Authored by Senator David (principal Senate author) |
2019-03-12 | House | General Order |
2019-02-20 | House | Emergency added |
2019-02-20 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation Committee |
2019-02-18 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2019-02-18 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Sneed |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2142 (Carry Over) 2019-05-14 - Approved by Governor 05/14/2019