OK HB2117 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Public finance; Local Development Act; public contracts.
Title
Public finance; Local Development Act; public contracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-13 - House - House: Conference Committee on Insurance: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 60 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House: Economic Development, Tourism: DO PASS (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 60 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House: Economic Development, Tourism: DO PASS (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-20 | Died in conference | |
2011-04-25 | Conference granted, SCs named Mazzei, Brinkley, Ford, David, Wilson, Ivester | |
2011-04-18 | HC's named: Conference Committee on Insurance and Economic Development | |
2011-04-12 | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later | |
2011-04-07 | SA's received | |
2011-04-07 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-04-06 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-04-06 | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 | |
2011-04-06 | General Order, Considered | |
2011-03-23 | coauthored by Ivester | |
2011-03-23 | Title stricken | |
2011-03-23 | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed | |
2011-03-21 | Second Reading referred to Finance | |
2011-03-15 | First Reading | |
2011-03-15 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-03-14 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-14 | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 14; Ayes: 60 Nays: 35 | |
2011-03-14 | General Order | |
2011-02-24 | Authored by Senator Mazzei (principal Senate author) | |
2011-02-24 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Jackson | |
2011-02-24 | CR; Do Pass Economic Development, Tourism and Financial Services Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Economic Development, Tourism and Financial Services | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Representative Hickman | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |