OK HB2100 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Second Reading referred to Energy
Pending: Senate Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Pipeline safety; construction and operation of pipelines; rules; emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pipeline safety; construction and operation of pipelines; rules; emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-26 - House - House: Energy and Natural Resources Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18SenateSecond Reading referred to Energy
2019-03-06SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-06HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-03-05HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-03-05HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 4
2019-03-05HouseTitle stricken
2019-03-05HouseAmended
2019-03-05HouseAuthored by Senator Rader (principal Senate author)
2019-03-05HouseGeneral Order
2019-02-27HouseEmergency added
2019-02-27HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Energy and Natural Resources Committee
2019-02-25HouseReferred to Energy and Natural Resources
2019-02-25HouseWithdrawn from Rules Committee
2019-02-06HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative O'Donnell
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback