CA SB1217 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 612, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 612, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 12880 and 12880.2 of, and to add Sections 12880.7 and 12880.8 to, the Insurance Code, relating to pet insurance.
Title
Pet insurance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-08-29 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1217 Glazer Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-08-28 - Assembly - SB 1217 Glazer Senate Third Reading By Calderon (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-08-07 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-23 - Senate - Special Consent SB1217 Glazer (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-08-28 - Assembly - SB 1217 Glazer Senate Third Reading By Calderon (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-08-07 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-23 - Senate - Special Consent SB1217 Glazer (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 612, Statutes of 2024. | |
2024-09-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2024-09-09 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2024-08-29 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5677.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2024-08-28 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2024-08-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6692.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2024-08-22 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-22 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2024-08-12 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-12 | Assembly | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Aguiar-Curry. |
2024-08-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2024-08-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (August 7). |
2024-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-19 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2024-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4181.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-05-20 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3976.) (May 16). |
2024-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2024-05-06 | Senate | May 6 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2024-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3757.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-10 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Insurance Code | 12880 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 12880.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 12880.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 12880.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |