OK HB2097 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-18 - Approved by Governor 04/18/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-18 - Approved by Governor 04/18/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Insurance; contracts for health care services; authorizing a member to request a printed contract; effective date.
Title
Insurance; contracts for health care services; authorizing a member to request a printed contract; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-18 | House | Approved by Governor 04/18/2016 |
2016-04-12 | House | Sent to Governor |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2016-04-12 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2016-04-11 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 |
2016-04-11 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Insurance committee; CR filed |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Insurance |
2016-03-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-03-08 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2016-03-07 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2016-03-07 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 1 |
2016-03-07 | House | Authored by Senator Brown (principal Senate author) |
2016-03-07 | House | General Order |
2016-02-29 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Moore |
2016-02-29 | House | Remove Representative Moore as principal House author and substitute with Representative Mulready |
2016-02-29 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance Committee |
2016-02-22 | House | Referred to Insurance |
2016-02-22 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Moore |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36 | 6060 | 1 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 6060 | 11 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 6060 | 2 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 6060 | 3 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 6060 | 3a | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 6060 | 4 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 6060 | 5 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 6060 | 6 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 6060 | 7 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 6060 | 8 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 6060 | 8a | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 6060 | 9 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 1 | 2605 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |