OK HB2090 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-28 - Withdrawn from Public Health, Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-28 - Withdrawn from Public Health, Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Summary
Public health and safety; creating the Oklahoma Health Reform Act of 2013; effective date.
Title
Public health and safety; creating the Oklahoma Health Reform Act of 2013; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-24 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Revenue & Taxation: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-28 | House | Withdrawn from Public Health, Direct to Calendar |
2013-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Health |
2013-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Mulready |
2013-02-04 | House | First Reading |