OK HB2087 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Schools; creating the Allowing Local Administrators More Options Act; effective date; emergency.
Title
Schools; creating the Allowing Local Administrators More Options Act; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 75 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 75 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-24 | House | Died in conference |
2013-05-07 | House | HC's named: Conference Committee on Common Education |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Jolley, Ford, Stanislawski, David, Shumate, Burrage |
2013-05-06 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later |
2013-04-24 | House | SA's received |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 2 |
2013-04-23 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Remove as author Representative Casey |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules committee |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2013-03-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-03-18 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-03-14 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-14 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 75 Nays: 19 |
2013-03-14 | House | Title stricken |
2013-03-14 | House | Amended |
2013-03-14 | House | Authored by Senator Jolley (principal Senate author) |
2013-03-14 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Cox |
2013-03-14 | House | General Order |
2013-02-27 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Smalley |
2013-02-27 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee |
2013-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2013-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Nelson, Casey |
2013-02-04 | House | First Reading |