OK HB2087 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-03 - Coauthored by Representative(s) Murphey, Key, Cockroft, Bennett, Shannon, Newell
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-03 - Coauthored by Representative(s) Murphey, Key, Cockroft, Bennett, Shannon, Newell
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Summary
Crimes and punishments; authorizing certain persons to carry concealed weapons on college or university property; effective date.
Title
Crimes and punishments; authorizing certain persons to carry concealed weapons on college or university property; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. John Bennett [R] | Rep. Josh Cockroft [R] | Rep. Charles Key [R] | Rep. Jason Murphey [R] |
Rep. Tom Newell [R] | Rep. Tahrohon Shannon [R] | Rep. Randy Terrill [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-02 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-03 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Murphey, Key, Cockroft, Bennett, Shannon, Newell | |
2011-03-03 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Representative Terrill | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |