OK HB2086 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2086
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-19 - CCR read
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-19 - CCR read
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Public finance; ensuring state agencies are charged no more than actual cost of certain services provided; authorizing settlement of disputes; effective date.
Title
Public finance; ensuring state agencies are charged no more than actual cost of certain services provided; authorizing settlement of disputes; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-19 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 86 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-19 | Senate | CCR read |
2022-05-19 | House | To Senate |
2022-05-19 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 1 |
2022-05-19 | House | CCR adopted |
2022-05-18 | House | Title restored |
2022-05-18 | House | CCR submitted |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Taylor, Simpson, Allen, Rader, Thompson, Rosino, Hicks |
2022-05-04 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Rules |
2022-05-02 | House | SA's received |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 |
2022-04-28 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Title stricken |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2021-03-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-03-15 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0 |
2021-03-11 | House | Amended by floor substitute |
2021-03-11 | House | Authored by Senator Taylor (principal Senate author) |
2021-03-11 | House | General Order |
2021-02-16 | House | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative McCall, ODonnell |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2086 (Carry Over) 2021-03-17 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations