OK HB2086 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-21 - Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-21 - Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Oklahoma Health Care Authority; SoonerCare RX plan analysis; effective date.
Title
Oklahoma Health Care Authority; SoonerCare RX plan analysis; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2013-03-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-03-18 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-03-14 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-14 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 |
2013-03-14 | House | Authored by Senator Standridge (principal Senate author) |
2013-03-14 | House | General Order |
2013-02-28 | House | Title stricken |
2013-02-28 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2013-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2013-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Derby |
2013-02-04 | House | First Reading |