OK HB2079 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2079
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-02 - Coauthored by Senator Bice
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-02 - Coauthored by Senator Bice
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
State government; performance audits; modifying provisions related to certain examinations by the State Auditor and Inspector; effective date; emergency.
Title
State government; performance audits; modifying provisions related to certain examinations by the State Auditor and Inspector; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Steagall [R] | Sen. Nathan Dahm [R] | Rep. Sean Roberts [R] | Rep. Denise Hader [R] |
Sen. Stephanie Bice [R] | Sen. David Bullard [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: Government Efficiency Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: Government Efficiency Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bice |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Withdrawn from General Government committee |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2019-03-05 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-04 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-04 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 0 |
2019-03-04 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Bullard |
2019-03-04 | House | Authored by Senator Dahm (principal Senate author) |
2019-03-04 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) CrosswhiteHader, Roberts (Sean) |
2019-03-04 | House | General Order |
2019-02-20 | House | Emergency added |
2019-02-20 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Government Efficiency Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Government Efficiency |
2019-02-14 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Steagall |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2079 (Carry Over) 2019-04-02 - Coauthored by Senator Bice