OK HB2072 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Approved by Governor 05/26/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Approved by Governor 05/26/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Insurance; revolving funds; creating the Unauthorized Insurers and Surplus Lines Insurance Act; creating the Uniform Health Carrier External Review Act.
Title
Insurance; revolving funds; creating the Unauthorized Insurers and Surplus Lines Insurance Act; creating the Uniform Health Carrier External Review Act.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Brown [D] | Rep. Charles Key [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-20 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - House - House: (Y: 67 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 53 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - House - House: Conference Committee on Insurance: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - House - House: (Y: 67 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 53 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - House - House: Conference Committee on Insurance: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-20 | Approved by Governor 05/26/2011 | |
2011-05-20 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-05-20 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2011-05-20 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2011-05-19 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-05-19 | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 39 Nays: 0 | |
2011-05-19 | CCR adopted | |
2011-05-18 | CCR read | |
2011-05-18 | To Senate | |
2011-05-18 | Motion to reconsider tabled | |
2011-05-18 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Reynolds | |
2011-05-18 | Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 67 Nays: 30; Ayes: 53 Nays: 38 | |
2011-05-18 | CCR adopted | |
2011-05-17 | Title restored | |
2011-05-17 | CCR submitted | |
2011-05-05 | Conference granted, SCs named Brown, Brecheen, Aldridge, Stanislawski, Bass, Sparks | |
2011-05-03 | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Insurance and Economic Development | |
2011-04-20 | SA's received | |
2011-04-20 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-04-19 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-04-19 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 4 | |
2011-04-19 | General Order, Amended | |
2011-04-19 | Senate Rule suspended | |
2011-04-19 | Title restored | |
2011-04-11 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed | |
2011-03-23 | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance | |
2011-03-22 | First Reading | |
2011-03-21 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-03-17 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-17 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 3 | |
2011-03-17 | Title stricken | |
2011-03-17 | Amended | |
2011-03-17 | Authored by Senator Brown (principal Senate author) | |
2011-03-17 | General Order | |
2011-03-07 | Emergency added | |
2011-03-07 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance Committee | |
2011-02-16 | Referred to Insurance Committee | |
2011-02-16 | Withdrawn from Rules Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Rules | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Representative Key | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36 | 101 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 1100 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 1100 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 1100 | 2 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 1101 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 1101 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 1103 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 1105 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 1106 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 1106 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 1107 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 1108 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 1109 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 1111 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 1112 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 1113 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 1114 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 1115 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 1116 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 1118 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 1250 | 17 | New Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 1435 | 23 | New Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 1435 | 29 | New Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 1524 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 307 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 307 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 3623 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 3639 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 4250 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 615 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 615 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 6202 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 6203 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 6204 | 1 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 6205 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 6206 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 6208 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 6209 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 6210 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 6212 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 6215 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 6217 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 6250 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 6251 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 6252 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 6253 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 6254 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 6255 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 6256 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 6257 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 6258 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 6259 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 6260 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 6261 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 6262 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 6263 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 6264 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 6265 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 6266 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 628 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 6475 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 6475 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 6475 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 6475 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 6475 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 6475 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 6475 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 6475 | 16 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 6475 | 17 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 6475 | 2 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 6475 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 6475 | 4 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 6475 | 5 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 6475 | 6 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 6475 | 7 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 6475 | 8 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 6475 | 9 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 6811 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 6940 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
63 | 2528 | 1 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 2528 | 10 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 2528 | 2 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 2528 | 3 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 2528 | 4 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 2528 | 5 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 2528 | 6 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 2528 | 7 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 2528 | 8 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 2528 | 9 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |