OK HB2062 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Approved by Governor 05/29/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Approved by Governor 05/29/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Technology; county purchasing procedures; updating language and modifying duties of the Information Services Division of the Office of Management and Enterprise Services and the Chief Information Officer; effective date; emergency.
Title
Technology; county purchasing procedures; updating language and modifying duties of the Information Services Division of the Office of Management and Enterprise Services and the Chief Information Officer; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-22 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-05-21 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 91 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - House - House: Government Modernization Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-21 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 91 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - House - House: Government Modernization Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-24 | House | Approved by Governor 05/29/2013 |
2013-05-23 | House | Sent to Governor |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2013-05-23 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2013-05-22 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 |
2013-05-22 | Senate | CCR adopted, GCCA |
2013-05-21 | Senate | CCR read, GCCA |
2013-05-21 | House | To Senate |
2013-05-21 | House | Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 4 |
2013-05-21 | House | CCR adopted |
2013-05-15 | House | Title restored |
2013-05-15 | House | CCR submitted |
2013-05-02 | House | HC's named: Conference Committee on Government Modernization |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Conference granted, GCCA |
2013-04-29 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later |
2013-04-24 | House | SA's received |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2013-04-23 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Title stricken |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Title stricken |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended General Government committee; CR filed |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2013-03-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-03-06 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-03-05 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-05 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 1 |
2013-03-05 | House | Authored by Senator Jolley (principal Senate author) |
2013-03-05 | House | General Order |
2013-02-18 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Murphey |
2013-02-18 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Government Modernization Committee |
2013-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Government Modernization |
2013-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Derby |
2013-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 1500 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 34 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 34 | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 34 | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 34 | 16 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 34 | 17 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 34 | 18 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 34 | 19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 34 | 21 | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 34 | 24 | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 34 | 25 | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 34 | 27 | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 34 | 28 | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 34 | 29 | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 35 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 35 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 35 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 35 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 35 | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 35 | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 3 | 114 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 3106 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 85 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 85 | 7c | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 85 | 7d | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 85 | 7h | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 85 | 7I | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 85 | 9D | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 85 | 9E | (n/a) | See Bill Text |