OK HB2056 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2056
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Approved by Governor 04/22/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Approved by Governor 04/22/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles; perfection of security interest; prohibiting certain title transfers; effective date.
Title
Motor vehicles; perfection of security interest; prohibiting certain title transfers; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-15 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-22 | House | Approved by Governor 04/22/2021 |
2021-04-19 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2021-04-19 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2021-04-15 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Finance committee; CR filed |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2021-03-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-03-09 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-03-08 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-08 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 0 |
2021-03-08 | House | Authored by Senator Rader (principal Senate author) |
2021-03-08 | House | General Order |
2021-02-10 | House | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative McCall |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2056 (Carry Over) 2021-04-22 - Approved by Governor 04/22/2021