OK HB2055 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Approved by Governor 05/29/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Approved by Governor 05/29/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Administrative Procedures Act; omnibus legislation to approve proposed state agency permanent rules; effective date.
Title
Administrative Procedures Act; omnibus legislation to approve proposed state agency permanent rules; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-23 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-05-22 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 73 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - House - House: Administrative Rules, Government Oversight and Repealer: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-22 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 73 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - House - House: Administrative Rules, Government Oversight and Repealer: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-24 | House | Approved by Governor 05/29/2013 |
2013-05-24 | House | Sent to Governor |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2013-05-23 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2013-05-23 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 38 Nays: 1 |
2013-05-23 | Senate | coauthored by Sparks |
2013-05-23 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2013-05-22 | Senate | CCR read |
2013-05-22 | House | To Senate |
2013-05-22 | House | Measure passed: Ayes: 73 Nays: 20 |
2013-05-22 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Ritze |
2013-05-22 | House | CCR adopted |
2013-05-16 | House | Title restored |
2013-05-16 | House | CCR submitted |
2013-05-14 | House | HC's named: Conference Committee on Administrative Rules, Government Oversight and Repealer |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Treat, Griffin, Bingman, Schulz, Burrage, Sparks |
2013-05-06 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later |
2013-04-29 | House | SA's received |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 |
2013-04-24 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules committee; CR filed |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2013-03-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-03-18 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-03-14 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-14 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 10 |
2013-03-14 | House | Amended |
2013-03-14 | House | House Rule suspended |
2013-03-14 | House | Title stricken |
2013-03-14 | House | Amended |
2013-03-14 | House | Authored by Senator Treat (principal Senate author) |
2013-03-14 | House | General Order |
2013-02-27 | House | CR; Do Pass Administrative Rules, Government Oversight and Repealer Committee |
2013-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules, Government Oversight and Repealer |
2013-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Jackson |
2013-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
75 | 250 | 1 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
75 | 250 | 10 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
75 | 250 | 2 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
75 | 250 | 3 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
75 | 250 | 4 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
75 | 250 | 4a | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
75 | 250 | 5 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
75 | 250 | 6 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
75 | 250 | 7 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
75 | 250 | 8 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
75 | 250 | 9 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
75 | 256 | 3 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
75 | 257 | 1 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
75 | 303 | 1 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
75 | 303 | 2 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
75 | 307 | 1 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
75 | 308 | 1 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
75 | 308 | 2 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
75 | 308 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
75 | 311 | 1 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
75 | 314 | 1 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
75 | 315 | 1 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |